U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GARCIA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Large Additional Attachment(s)]
  • January 25, 2023: [Notice of Error]
  • January 24, 2023: [Declaration]
  • January 23, 2023: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Filing Trial Exhibits Introduced Into Evidence]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • January 02, 2023: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.