U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARTER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 27, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 13, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.