U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TATUM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 03, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 01, 2022: [Stipulation to Jury]
  • June 01, 2022: [Statement of Case]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • June 01, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Protective Order ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • May 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 20, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • May 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • April 29, 2022: [Suppress]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2022: [404(b) Evidence]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • April 06, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.