U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OLSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2022: [Rule 20 - Consent In(Transf) ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.