U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAHERZADEH et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • April 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 18, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Stay]
  • April 11, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • April 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.