U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CANTRELL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Appear]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.