U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BURROUGHS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Exclude]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Exclude]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.