U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PHIRI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
  • September 02, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 01, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Status Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Leave to File Denied]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • May 17, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • May 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Review]
  • April 28, 2022: [Bond ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Permit]
  • April 19, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.