U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00104-3
  • Case Name: USA v. HARRIGAN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 01, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Vacate]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • January 12, 2023: [Modify]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • December 26, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Leave to Join]
  • December 01, 2022: [.Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Criminal History Report]
  • November 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Criminal History Report]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [.Order]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Medical Treatment ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Protective Order ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 27, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 18, 2022: [Medical Treatment ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Criminal History Report]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sentencing Guidelines]
  • June 14, 2022: [Sentencing Guidelines]
  • June 14, 2022: [Criminal History Report]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 28, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.