U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MUNGER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 28, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • October 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • May 20, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 20, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 20, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • May 05, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 05, 2022: [Statement of Facts in Support of Plea Agreement ]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.