U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PAGE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 09, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 22, 2022: [Suppress]
  • August 22, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2022: [404(b) Evidence]
  • August 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • April 28, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 26, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2022: [Revoke]
  • April 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 14, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 12, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.