U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MILES et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 13, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.