U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GERWATOWSKI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 22, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Exclude]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Exclude]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.