U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NORRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Probation Order]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order directing action by Probation Office]
  • November 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • May 05, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 05, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.