U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DOUGLAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Probation Order]
October, 2022
  • October 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 31, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 31, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 27, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2022: [.Order]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 11, 2022: [Vacate]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.