U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00032
  • Case Name: DOE v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of QC]
  • July 22, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.