U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 07, 2024: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Supplement to any document]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 26, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 29, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • August 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Indictment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever Count(s)]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 16, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • August 15, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • August 15, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • August 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 15, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Statement of Case]
  • August 14, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • August 14, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 14, 2022: [Suppress]
  • August 14, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • August 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 10, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • August 10, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 10, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sever Count(s)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Suppress]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 01, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 19, 2022: [Indictment]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.