U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRAUN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 04, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Protective Order ]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 19, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 19, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.