U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GIONET
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 22, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • May 13, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.