U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GLOVER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [.Order]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [.Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 26, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • April 20, 2022: [Stay]
  • April 20, 2022: [Review]
  • April 19, 2022: [Indictment]
  • April 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2022: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.