U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAHERZADEH et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Modify]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 11, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 11, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 09, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • September 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 05, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Deferred of PSI Report]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 08, 2022: [Bond ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2022: [Protective Order ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Indictment]
  • April 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.