U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • May 26, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 26, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 26, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.