U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MILES et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 19, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 08, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Indictment]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.