U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SOTO, JR. et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Reply in Support]
  • January 13, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 04, 2023: [Leave to Join]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 30, 2022: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • August 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 03, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 28, 2022: [Joinder]
  • July 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • July 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • June 10, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • June 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 03, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 27, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 17, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 12, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 09, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 09, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • April 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.