U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SUTTON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 13, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 07, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • May 07, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 07, 2025: [Temporary Detention ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 04, 2025: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • May 04, 2025: [Bond ]
  • May 03, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Protective Order ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.