U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00072
  • Case Name: Archimedes Innovations, PBC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Filing of Transcript]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 (Dismissed)]
  • June 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Dismiss Case]
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • June 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Response]
  • June 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Electronic Deficiency - No Attorney Identifiers]
  • June 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Response]
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Involuntary Summons Service Executed]
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Appear pro hac vice]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • May 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Support Document]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Expedite Hearing]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Electronic Deficiency - Ntc of Opp to Object Not Filed]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Electronic Deficiency - Generic]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Dismiss Case]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure Statement]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Involuntary Summons Service Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Summons Issued - Involuntary]
  • April 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.