U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VARNER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Exclude]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Exclude]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Exclude]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • April 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.