U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00075
  • Case Name: Johnny R. Boggs and Brandon A. Galindo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To File Amended Matrix With Cover Sheet Or Show Cause]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
April, 2022
  • April 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.