U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00076
  • Case Name: Robert Leroy Gale
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Request to Withdraw Document]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Unsecured Claim]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To File Summary Of Your Assets And Liabilities]
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Document (Do NOT use this event if amending a matrix or schedules A-J)]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Request to Withdraw Document]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Electronic Deficiency - Outdated Form]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • May 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Electronic Deficiency - Generic]
  • May 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • May 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order to File Required Documents]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.