U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-10003-
  • Case Name: Venture Resources Consulting, LLC et al v. Albert et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Receipt of Record re Withdrawal of Reference]
  • July 06, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference]
  • July 05, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Voluntary or Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Continued (AP)]
  • June 24, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference]
  • June 10, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Continued (by Order)]
  • June 10, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Consent Order]
  • June 06, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • June 06, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 06, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Reference]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Electronic Deficiency - Generic]
  • May 27, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Opposition]
  • May 27, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 26, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • May 17, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • May 13, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) AP]
  • May 13, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Consent Order]
  • May 11, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons - Service Executed]
  • May 05, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • May 02, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
  • May 02, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.