U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLGAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 26, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 12, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 03, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.