U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-10005-
  • Case Name: Naheed Ghassemi Revocable Trust v. 8th Street Venture Holdings LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
  • October 27, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 19, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order - Generic]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Re-Issued]
  • August 25, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 25, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons - Request to Re-Issue]
  • August 24, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Continued (AP)]
  • August 09, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Re-Issued]
  • August 08, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons - Request to Re-Issue]
  • August 04, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Discovery]
  • August 02, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Counterclaim]
  • August 02, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 21, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Counterclaim]
  • July 21, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 21, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Electronic Deficiency - No Attorney Identifiers]
  • July 20, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Counterclaim]
  • July 20, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 06, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Continued (AP)]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • June 18, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 06, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • May 03, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Draft Summons]
  • May 03, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 03, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.