U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00047
  • Case Name: PALANTIR TECHNOLOGIES INC. v. WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Surreply]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • July 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 08, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Stay]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 17, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 10, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 10, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 04, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • May 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 04, 2022: [Issue Subpoena]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.