U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HEATHCOTE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.