U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HORVATH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.