U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERBERT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 16, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • May 10, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.