U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KELLEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • December 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Exclude]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Exclude]
July, 2022
  • July 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.