U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00080
  • Case Name: Theresa Ann Robinson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • May 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File 121 Statement]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order File Form 121 Statement]
  • May 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • May 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.