U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WARGO et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 09, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 09, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.