U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00699-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GERMINE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • December 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • October 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Criminal History Report]
  • October 01, 2022: [Criminal History Report]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2022: [Indictment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 18, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 18, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • May 10, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.