U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLARK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Status Report]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.