U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00083
  • Case Name: Tania Renai Owens
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Modify Plan]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Support Document]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Modify Plan]
October, 2022
  • October 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Proposed Order]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
  • September 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Matrix or Schedules: Change EXISITING Name and/or Address]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order on Motion to Determine Value of Property/Security]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Electronic Deficiency - Generic]
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
  • July 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount or Reclassificati]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Electronic Deficiency - Certificate of Service Not Included]
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Determine Value of Property/Security]
May, 2022
  • May 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • May 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.