U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RANDOLPH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 15, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Statement of Facts in Support of Plea Agreement ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 04, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • August 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.