U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BUCKLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • July 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 27, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • May 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 27, 2022: [Deferred of PSI Report]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.