U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GERMINE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • May 05, 2025: [Jury Selection - Do Not Use If Jurors Sworn/Trial Began]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to Opposition]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 29, 2025: [404(b) Evidence]
  • April 29, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 23, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to Opposition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for 404(b) Evidence]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for 404(b) Evidence]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Review]
  • April 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • April 02, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply in Support]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply in Support]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to Opposition]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Criminal History Report]
  • October 01, 2022: [Criminal History Report]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • September 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2022: [Indictment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 12, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • May 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.