U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GIETZEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • May 31, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 11, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.