U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00086
  • Case Name: Meagan A. Cuff
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order Denying Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • May 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • May 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order to File Required Documents]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.