U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00085-
  • Case Name: Promise Octavia Green
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 (Dismissed)]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order Dismiss Case (Judge)]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Have the Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • May 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [eNoticing Request Form]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order to File Required Documents]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Exigent Circumstances re: Credit Counseling]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.