U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MAHNKE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 06, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 06, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 06, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 06, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.