U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TODD III
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Status Report]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 03, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 03, 2022: [In Limine ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • September 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 16, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 20, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.